EP4023133 - ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE ROBOT CLEANER, AND ROBOT SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Jaewon IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Yeongjae IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
HAM, Seaunglok IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20859269.1 | 17.02.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020KR02197 | Priority number, date | KR20190105318 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190105318 | KR20200000784 | 03.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200000784 | [2022/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040160 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023133 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40, B25J19/02, B25J11/00, B25J9/16, H04M1/725 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A47L11/4011 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/282 (US);
A47L11/4008 (KR);
A47L11/4038 (EP,US);
A47L11/4061 (EP);
A47L11/4066 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/4072 (EP);
B25J11/0085 (KR);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J9/1674 (KR);
H04M1/72415 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/00 (EP);
A47L2201/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/06 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSROBOTER MIT KÜNSTLICHER INTELLIGENZ UND ROBOTERSYSTEM, DAS DIESES UMFASST | [2022/27] | English: | ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE ROBOT CLEANER, AND ROBOT SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME | [2022/27] | French: | ROBOT NETTOYEUR À INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE ET SYSTÈME ROBOTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | Translation filed | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019223677 (YOON SUNGHO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] *; | [A]WO2019143172 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0089] - [0098] - [0241] * | International search | [A]KR20150006525 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20170128248 (IROBOT CORP [US]); | [A]KR101911294B ; | [A]KR20190004349 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [YA]KR20190088691 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR20040052094 | KR20090019480 | KR20140146702 |