EP4024250 - VEHICLE MONITORING DEVICE AND VEHICLE MONITORING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 2050 W 190th Street Suite 450 Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHIKAWA, Takeshi Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Ryo Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
UJIIE, Yoshihiro Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
HAGA, Tomoyuki Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20859607.2 | 19.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP31228 | Priority number, date | WO2019JP34263 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: PCT/JP2019/034263 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021039523 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024250 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/55, H04W12/122, // H04L12/40 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (CN);
B60W40/09 (EP,US);
B60W40/12 (US);
B60W50/14 (EP);
G06F21/14 (EP,US);
G06F21/55 (US);
G07C5/0808 (CN);
H04L12/40006 (CN);
H04L63/1416 (EP,CN);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP);
H04W4/48 (EP,US);
B60W2050/143 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2540/12 (EP);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2756/10 (EP);
G06F2221/034 (EP);
H04L2012/40215 (CN);
H04L67/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G06F21/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUGÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/27] | English: | VEHICLE MONITORING DEVICE AND VEHICLE MONITORING METHOD | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE VÉHICULES | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | Translation filed | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017013005 (GALULA YARON [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12,13 * figures 1c,5-13 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0239] * * paragraph [0295] - paragraph [0302] * [I] 5,9,11; | [A]US2019215339 (CHEN ABRAHAM TAI-YU [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 2,3 ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * | International search | [A]JP2017111796 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA) [A] 1-13 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2019030763 (ARGUS CYBER SECURITY LTD [IL]) [A] 1-13* entire text, all drawings *; | [A] - SMITH, CRAIG, "Passage; Car Hackers Handbook [Car Hack Club Translation]", Car Hackers Handbook: In-Vehicle System Mechanism / Analysis / Security [Car Hack Club Translation]; 1st ed, 1st pr., JP, O'REILLY JAPAN INC, (20161130), vol. 1, pages 73 - 98, ISBN 978-4-87311-823-9, XP009528937 [A] 1-13 | by applicant | JP5664799B |