EP3963514 - ANALOG HARDWARE REALIZATION OF NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolyN Technology Limited 2nd floor 6 Market Place Fitzrovia London W1W 8AF / GB | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASLOV, Boris London W1W 8AF / GB | 02 /
KOVSHOV, Nikolai Vadimovich London W1W 8AF / GB | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Paterson, Colin Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20859652.8 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020RU00306 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021262023 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963514 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.12.2021 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 26.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06G7/60 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06N3/065 (EP,KR);
G06F17/16 (KR);
G06N3/044 (EP,KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR);
G06N3/048 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | ANALOGE HARDWARE-REALISIERUNG NEURONALER NETZE | [2022/10] | English: | ANALOG HARDWARE REALIZATION OF NEURAL NETWORKS | [2022/10] | French: | RÉALISATION MATÉRIELLE ANALOGIQUE DE RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 29.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5047655 (CHAMBOST EMMANUEL [FR], et al); | [A]US5315163 (KARINTHI PIERRE [FR]); | [A]US2016283842 (PESCIANSCHI DMITRI [DE]); | [A]EP3663988 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |