EP3987758 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING CAMERA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOO, Sunggwan 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Kyeongeun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Changkeun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
BAE, Jaecheol 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
AHN, Sungho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Bowon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
JUNG, Songhee 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20860351.4 | 07.09.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020KR12039 | Priority number, date | KR20190110637 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190110637 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021045593 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3987758 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04N5/225, H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H10K59/87 (EP,KR);
H04M1/0264 (KR);
H10K59/65 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/021 (US);
H04B1/3827 (US);
H04M1/0266 (KR);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/55 (KR);
H04N23/57 (EP,KR);
H10K50/84 (US);
H10K50/86 (US);
H10K50/87 (US);
H10K59/12 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/40 (US);
H10K59/8791 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H04M1/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT KAMERAMODUL | [2022/17] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING CAMERA MODULE | [2022/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN MODULE DE CAMÉRA | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN107241466 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [Y] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2018151834 (KANAYA HEISUKE [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053] , [0060] , [0061] , [0116]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]WO2018216545 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8 * paragraph [0038]; figure 13 *; | [Y]US2019073505 (KWON SUCHAN [KR], et al) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0050] , [0055] , [0108]; figures 3,7 *; | [Y]CN110062082 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-8,12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0046]; figures 2,7 *; | [A]CN110112200 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 8* paragraph [0065]; figure 7 *; | [XY]CN110149470 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0045] - [0056]; figure 2; claim 1 * [Y] 1-15; | WO2021033919 [ ] (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [ ] * paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0065] , [0066] , [0068]; figures 5a,5b *; | [E]EP3977714 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,12,13,15 * figures 5a,5b * | International search | [A]US2017068287 (JUNG ILCHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0076]-[0082] and figure 4. *; | [A]US2017186891 (MIN MYUNG-AN [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0042]-[0047] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2017287992 (KWAK WONGEUN [KR], et al) [Y] 2-15 * See paragraphs [0134]-[0242] and figure 6A. *; | [A]US2019243417 (CHENG JIAO [CN]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0057] and figures 5-8. *; | [YX]CN110149470 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [Y] 2-15 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0056], claim 1 and figure 2. * [X] 1 | by applicant | CN107241466 | US2018151834 | WO2018216545 | US2019073505 | CN110062082 | CN110149470 |