EP4025494 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING A CARGO AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZSM Holdings LLC C/o Registered Agent Solutions, Inc. 9 E. Loockerman Street Suite 311 Dover, Delaware 19901 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Jason, C. 929 Pearl Street Suite 200 Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 02 /
KARNI, Etan, D. 929 Pearl Street Suite 200 Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 03 /
REWERTS, Scott, David 929 Pearl Street Suite 200 Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 04 /
SINGH, Ravi 1490 Delgany Street Apt. 401 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20860411.6 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US49784 | Priority number, date | US201962896529P | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962896529 P | US201962896533P | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962896533 P | US201962938853P | 21.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938853 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021046557 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025494 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/20, B64F1/32, B64C1/22, B64D9/00, B64C1/14 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B64D9/003 (EP,IL,US);
B64C1/00 (EP,IL,US);
B64C1/06 (EP,IL,US);
B64C1/0683 (US);
B64C1/14 (IL);
B64C1/1415 (EP,IL,US);
B64C1/20 (EP,IL,US);
B64C1/22 (EP,IL,US);
B64C17/08 (IL,US);
B64C25/00 (IL);
B64C25/32 (EP,IL);
B64C3/32 (IL,US);
B64C3/34 (IL,US);
B64C39/00 (EP,IL,US);
B64C39/02 (EP,IL,US);
B64D13/00 (IL);
B64D37/04 (IL,US);
B64D9/00 (IL,US);
B64F1/32 (EP,IL,US);
F03D13/40 (US);
B64D2009/006 (EP,IL,US);
B64U20/65 (EP,IL,US);
B64U2101/60 (US);
B64U70/60 (EP,IL,US);
F05B2260/02 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02T50/40 (EP);
Y02T50/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | B64C1/20, B64F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Validation states | MA | 04.04.2022 | TN | 04.04.2022 | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM BE- UND ENTLADEN EINES FRACHTFLUGZEUGS | [2022/28] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING A CARGO AIRCRAFT | [2022/28] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉCHARGEMENT D'UN AVION CARGO | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2268009 (BABB CHARLES H, et al); | [XA]EP0196923 (SHORT BROTHERS PLC [GB]); | [XY]US5267709 (KOHARCHECK ALAN W [US], et al); | [Y]US2006108477 (HELOU ELIE JR [US]) | International search | [A]US8398022 (CAZALS OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [A]US2015225082 (LEVRON RAMI [IL]); | [A]US2016311512 (SANKRITHI MITHRA [US]); | [A]US2017349263 (LOPEZ ANA RUBIO [ES], et al); | [A]US2018273176 (PAUNICKA JAMES LOUIS [US], et al) | by applicant | US2268009 | EP0196923 | US5267709 | US2006108477 |