EP3920283 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, LITHIUM-ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME, BATTERY PACK, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOU, Shushi No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HU, Chunhua No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Yao No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
WU, Qi No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
HE, Jinhua No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
DENG, Bin No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
DOU, Shushi Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
HU, Chunhua Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
JIANG, Yao Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
WU, Qi Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
05 /
HE, Jinhua Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
06 /
DENG, Bin Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20860638.4 | 18.08.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN109843 | Priority number, date | CN201910845573 | 02.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910845573 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021042983 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920283 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M4/485, H01M10/0525, H01M4/66 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C01G53/50 (EP);
H01M4/362 (CN);
H01M4/525 (EP,CN,US);
C01G53/42 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (CN,US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/131 (CN,US);
H01M4/485 (CN);
H01M4/505 (CN);
H01M4/667 (CN);
C01P2002/20 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2002/76 (EP);
C01P2002/85 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | AKTIVES POSITIVES ELEKTRODENMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG, POSITIVE ELEKTRODENPLATTE, LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND BATTERIEMODUL DAMIT, BATTERIEPACK UND VORRICHTUNG | [2021/49] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, LITHIUM-ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME, BATTERY PACK, AND DEVICE | [2021/49] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, PLAQUE D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LA COMPRENANT, BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2021 | Translation filed | 02.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - AZIAM H. ET AL, "Understanding the electrochemical lithiation/delithiation process in the anode material for lithium ion batteries NiFeOPO4/C using ex-situ X-ray absorption near edge spectroscopy and in-situ synchrotron X-ray", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180901), vol. 283, doi:10.1016/j.electacta.2018.07.038, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 1238 - 1244, XP055916509 [T] * page 1242, paragraph 3.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2018.07.038 | [XY] - PING CUI ET AL, "Preparation and characteristics of Sb-doped LiNiOcathode materials for Li-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF SOLIDS, PERGAMON PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 72, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JPCS.2011.04.013, ISSN 0022-3697, (20110422), pages 899 - 903, (20110429), XP028221252 [X] 1 * page 900, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpcs.2011.04.013 | [XY] - LEI YIKE ET AL, "Nb-doping in LiNi0.8Co0.1Mn0.1O2 cathode material: Effect on the cycling stability and voltage decay at high rates", JOURNAL OF THE TAIWAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20190208), vol. 97, doi:10.1016/j.jtice.2019.02.006, ISSN 1876-1070, pages 255 - 263, XP055916576 [X] 1 * page 256, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtice.2019.02.006 |