EP4026855 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANBA, Yoshinori c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Emi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
YAMABE, Takuya c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
FUJIMOTO, Yohei c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
ICHIKAWA, Kenji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
KATO, Taketo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 07 /
YAMANAKA, Taku c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 08 /
YOSHIDA, Hirotoshi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20861189.7 | 07.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020JP33762 | Priority number, date | JP20190162403 | 05.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019162403 | JP20190209164 | 19.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019209164 | [2022/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021045227 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026855 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/16, C08F259/08, C08L27/18, C08F14/26, C09D127/18, C08F214/26, // C08F116/14, C08F2/20 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
C08F2/20 (EP);
C08F14/26 (EP,US);
C08F214/26 (EP);
C08F214/262 (EP);
C08F259/08 (EP);
C08F6/22 (EP);
C08L27/18 (EP);
C08L51/003 (EP);
C09D127/18 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F14/26, C08F2/20 (EP);
C08F214/262, C08F216/1408 (EP);
C08F214/26, C08F214/28 (EP);
C08F259/08, C08F214/26 (EP);
C08F6/22, C08L27/18 (EP);
C08L27/18, C08L29/10 (EP);
C08L27/18, C08L29/10, C08L71/02 (EP);
C09D127/18, C08L29/10 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/28] | C08F6/16, C08F259/08, C08L27/02, C08L27/14, C08L27/18, C08L27/24, C08F2/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/28] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/28] | French: | COMPOSITION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | Translation filed | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH11181009 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [YD] 1-15 * example 3 *; | [Y]WO2007007422 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1849829 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [E]EP3760649 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2,5-11,13,14 * examples 1, 7 * * paragraph [0579] *; | [E]EP3960773 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7,9,10,15 * example 1 * * paragraph [0550] * | International search | [XY]JPH11181009 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 30-32 * [1], [3], [0019], [0026]-[0028] * [Y] 1-29,33-44; | [Y]WO2007007422 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-29,33-44 * [1]-[8], [0008] [0018] *; | [Y]WO2019031617 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 17, 24, 25, 29, 37-44* [1]-[29], [0004], [1125] * | by applicant | US3250808 | US3271341 | US3391099 | JPS55120630 | JPS61293476 | WO8707619 | WO9217635 | JP2538783B | US5804654 | JP2827152B | JPH1129679 | JPH1149912 | JPH11181009 | WO9962858 | JP2001226436 | JP2003002980 | WO03020836 | JP2003119204 | JP2004075978 | WO2004050719 | WO2004067588 | WO2004078836 | US6841616 | WO2005032583 | WO2005042593 | WO2006119224 | WO2006135825 | WO2007000812 | WO2007004250 | US2007015864 | US2007015865 | US2007015866 | WO2007046377 | WO2007046482 | WO2007046345 | US2007117914 | US2007142541 | WO2007119526 | US2007276103 | US2008015319 | WO2008060461 | WO2009055521 | WO2009068528 | WO2010075497 | WO2010075496 | WO2010075494 | WO2010075359 | WO2010147617 | WO2011008381 | WO2011014715 | WO2012002038 | WO2012082454 | WO2012082707 | WO2012082703 | WO2012082451 | WO2013027850 | WO2013085864 | WO2013146950 | WO2013146947 | WO2013189824 | WO2013189826 | WO2014069165 | WO2014084399 | WO2014099453 | US2014228531 | - KASAI, J. Appl. Polymer Sci., (19950000), vol. 57, page 797 |