EP4027561 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNALING INFORMATION, AND COMMUNICATION NODE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Huahua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Chuangxin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Zhaohua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Shujuan ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
LI, Yu Ngok ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 06 /
WU, Hao ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 07 /
YE, Xinquan ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 08 /
SHAO, Shijia ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 09 /
PAN, Yu ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20861209.3 | 21.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020CN110425 | Priority number, date | CN201910828953 | 03.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910828953 | [2022/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043008 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027561 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04B17/30 (CN);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04B17/382 (CN);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON SIGNALISIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSKNOTEN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNALING INFORMATION, AND COMMUNICATION NODE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE SIGNALISATION, ET NOEUD DE COMMUNICATION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | Translation filed | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2534785 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [X]WO2019047950 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); |