EP4025900 - LASER-INDUCED SPECTROSCOPY SYSTEM AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schenck Process LLC 7901 NW 107th Terrace Kansas City, MO 64153 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAHAN, Randy James 16815 Forestwood Drive Strongsville, Ohio 44149 / US | 02 /
NOWAKOWSKI, John Joseph 3571 Burrwood Drive Richfield, Ohio 44286 / US | 03 /
CALLAHAN, Lauren Elizabeth 5900 Churchill Way Medina, Ohio 44256 / US | 04 /
URBANEK, Geoffrey K. 1209 Kennedy Road Streetsboro, Ohio 44241 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20861366.1 | 21.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US47309 | Priority number, date | US201916561638 | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US201916561638 | US201916561704 | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US201916561704 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021045911 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025900 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/71, G01J3/30, G01N21/15, G01N21/85, // G01J3/02, G01J3/443 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G01N21/718 (EP,CN,KR);
G01J3/0202 (EP,KR);
G01J3/0208 (EP,KR);
G01J3/0291 (EP,KR);
G01J3/443 (EP,KR);
G01N21/01 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G01N21/71, G01J3/30, G01N21/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | LASERINDUZIERTES SPEKTROSKOPIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2022/28] | English: | LASER-INDUCED SPECTROSCOPY SYSTEM AND PROCESS | [2022/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SPECTROSCOPIE INDUITE PAR LASER | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013265565 (DAVIS VAUGHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2014204377 (DAY DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0084] , [ 130] , [ 141] * * figures 18,22,23 *[I] 3; | [A]US2016084709 (DAY DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 12,13,18 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0101] *; | [X]US2016131581 (SUN LANXIANG [CN], et al) [X] 1,7 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0011] , [ 0063] - [0071] *; | [XA]CN105738348 (UNIV SCIENCE & TECH CHINA) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] * * pages 1,3; figure / * [A] 2-4 | International search | [A]US4443072 (BALLARD EVAN O [US]) [A] 1-40; | [A]US2003234928 (LUCAS JOHN M [CA], et al)[A] 1-40; | [A]US2013265565 (DAVIS VAUGHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-40; | [A]US2016084709 (DAY DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-40; | [A]CN207779903U (HBIS CO LTD) [A] 1-40 |