EP4026517 - TUBULAR TREATMENT TOOL MEMBRANE BODY AND TUBULAR TREATMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SB-Kawasumi Laboratories, Inc. 3-25-4 Tonomachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states SB-Kawasumi Laboratories, Inc. 3-25-4 Tonomachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 210-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRAHAMA Noriaki c/o SB-KAWASUMI LABORATORIES, INC., 3-25-4 Tonomachi Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20861851.2 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020JP31434 | Priority number, date | JP20190160915 | 04.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019160915 | [2022/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021044858 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026517 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/07 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (US);
A61F2250/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | ROHRFÖRMIGER BEHANDLUNGSWERKZEUGMEMBRANKÖRPER UND ROHRFÖRMIGES BEHANDLUNGSWERKZEUG | [2022/28] | English: | TUBULAR TREATMENT TOOL MEMBRANE BODY AND TUBULAR TREATMENT TOOL | [2022/28] | French: | CORPS DE MEMBRANE D'OUTIL DE TRAITEMENT TUBULAIRE ET OUTIL DE TRAITEMENT TUBULAIRE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | Translation filed | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0009041 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 10, line 18 - page 16, line 17; figures 1,1A * [I] 3,4; | [XI]WO0249536 (NICAST LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * page 14, line 14 - page 16, line 24; figure 1C * [I] 2-4; | [A]EP2103278 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0055] - [0057]; figure 7 * | International search | [XA]JPH0677600B (TERUMO CORP.) [X] 1 * , column 8, lines 16-20 * [A] 2-4; | [XY]JP2002522155 (BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED INC.) [X] 1-2 * , claims 9-10, paragraphs [0031], [0044], [0045], [0047], [0055], fig. 1-1A * [Y] 3-4; | [YA]WO2019078218 (KAWASUMI LAB INC [JP]) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraphs [0011], [0016], fig. 1, 2 *[A] 1-2 | by applicant | JPS5824759B | JPS6131441B |