EP3836806 - VAPORIZER AND AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT&G Corporation 71, Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Tae Hun 102-503 24 Jinsan-ro 34beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16925 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Hun Il 332-1903 62 Jamsil-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05555 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Hyung Jin 112-506 22 Dongjak-daero 39-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 06993 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Jae Sung 303-1502 152 Chungmin-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05792 / KR | 05 /
HAN, Jung Ho 802-1002 3 Baeul 2-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34021 / KR | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20861972.6 | 06.10.2020 | [2021/25] | WO2020KR13572 | Priority number, date | KR20190126294 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190126294 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071201 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836806 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/44, A24F40/30 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A24F40/30 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,CN,KR);
A24F47/00 (CN);
A24F40/44 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (US);
A24F40/42 (CN,US);
A24F40/46 (CN);
A24F40/485 (US);
A24F40/48 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | A24F40/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | VERDAMPFER UND AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/25] | English: | VAPORIZER AND AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2021/25] | French: | VAPORISATEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL LE COMPRENANT | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9986762 (ALARCON RAMON [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** figures 1-19B *; | [XI]WO2018208078 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 5-7,9; | [A]US2019046745 (NETTENSTROM MATTHEW JOEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0103]; figures 11A, 11B * | International search | [A]KR20130005328 (LEE YONG YIN [KR])[A] 1-11; | [A]KR20160005323 (KIM HAN KI [KR]) [A] 1-11; | [A]US2016128386 (CHEN ZHIPING [CN]) [A] 1-11; | [A]KR20160082570 (KIM HAN KI [KR]) [A] 1-11; | [X]KR20180124736 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [X] 1-11 |