EP4029562 - PARTICLE BEAM IRRADIATION SYSTEM AND PARTICLE BEAM IRRADIATION FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIZAWA, Kenichi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
NISHIUCHI, Hideaki c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
KATAYOSE, Tadashi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20862026.0 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP25029 | Priority number, date | JP20190166000 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019166000 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049131 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029562 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
A61N5/1081 (EP);
A61N5/1077 (US);
A61N5/1049 (US);
A61N2005/1085 (US);
A61N2005/1087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | TEILCHENSTRAHLBESTRAHLUNGSSYSTEM UND TEILCHENSTRAHLBESTRAHLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2022/29] | English: | PARTICLE BEAM IRRADIATION SYSTEM AND PARTICLE BEAM IRRADIATION FACILITY | [2022/29] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IRRADIATION PAR FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES ET PROCÉDÉ D'IRRADIATION PAR FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012228522 (SASAI KENZO [JP]) [X] 1-5,14 * the whole document * [I] 12,13; | [Y]US2014319383 (YAJIMA SATORU [JP]) [Y] 7* figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2015071430 (DANFYSIK AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XAY]US2018104510 (ELGART FAYE HENDLEY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0258] * [A] 10,11 [Y] 7 | International search | [XYA]JP2011182987 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 4-5, 8-9,12-14 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0041], [0084], fig. 1-4 * [Y] 7, 15 [A] 10-11; | [Y]WO2013108534 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0028], fig. 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO2015042525 (PRONOVA SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [Y] 15* , paragraphs [0026], [0030]-[0035], fig. 1, 5 *; | [XYA]WO2017212290 (LANCASTER UNIV BUSINESS ENTERPRISES LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-6, 8, 12-13 * , page 13, lines 22-30, fig. 7 * [Y] 7 [A] 10-11 |