EP4029696 - INKJET PRINTING METHOD AND INK SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mimaki Engineering Co., Ltd. 2182-3 Shigeno-Otsu Tomi-city Nagano 389-0512 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATSU, Akira c/o MIMAKI ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 2182-3, Shigeno- Otsu Tomi-city, Nagano 3890512 / JP | 02 /
HORIUCHI, Shun c/o MIMAKI ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 2182-3, Shigeno- Otsu Tomi-city, Nagano 3890512 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20862037.7 | 24.08.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP31797 | Priority number, date | JP20190167675 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019167675 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049279 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029696 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41J2/21, B33Y10/00, B41M5/00, B29C64/112, B41J11/00, C09D11/00, B33Y70/00, B41J2/15 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B41J11/00212 (US);
B29C64/112 (EP);
B29C64/314 (EP);
B33Y40/00 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J2/15 (EP);
B41J2/2114 (US);
B41J2/2132 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D11/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | B41J2/01, B41J2/21, B33Y10/00, B41M5/00, B29C64/112 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVERFAHREN UND TINTENSATZ | [2022/29] | English: | INKJET PRINTING METHOD AND INK SET | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE ET ENSEMBLE D'ENCRES | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 10.02.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2946934 (OCE TECH BV [NL]); | [X]EP3132920 (MIMAKI ENG CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2002193373 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2002237103 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JP2004106297 (CANON KK); | [A]US2006014847 (COHEN EYTAN [IL], et al); | [A]JP2009255509 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2013237198 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2014185214 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2018203912 (TAIYO INK MFG CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2018065308 |