EP4024786 - SERVICE ROUTING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xiaomin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GU, Shuheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHUANG, Guanhua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Feng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20862833.9 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN114060 | Priority number, date | CN201910867138 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910867138 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021047515 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024786 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/02 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04L45/745 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/74 (CN);
H04L45/02 (EP,CN);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L45/64 (EP);
H04L45/76 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04L12/741 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | DIENST-ROUTING-VERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | SERVICE ROUTING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACHEMINEMENT DE SERVICE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006120391 (BASU SUJOY [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * [Y] 2-8,10-15; | [Y]US2014330985 (WONG WENDY C [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,10-13 * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0142] *; | [Y]CN109565472 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 6-8,14,15 * the whole document *; | [E]US11165689 (ZHANG HANG [CA]) [E] 6-8,14,15* column 34, line 4 - line 10 * |