EP4029057 - MULTI-COLOR LED PIXEL UNIT AND MICRO-LED DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jade Bird Display (Shanghai) Limited No. 1889, Hongyin Road Pudong New Area Shanghai / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiming 1876 Smarty Jones St. Albuquerque, New Mexico 87123 / US | 02 /
XU, Qunchao 1889 Hongyin Road, Lingang Industry Park Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20863087.1 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020IB00733 | Priority number, date | US201916567123 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: US201916567123 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048622 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029057 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP);
H01L33/08 (KR);
H01L27/15 (US);
H01L25/0753 (KR);
H01L27/153 (KR);
H01L33/0093 (EP,US);
H01L33/24 (US);
H01L33/385 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/42 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | MEHRFARBIGE LED-PIXELEINHEIT UND MIKRO-LED-ANZEIGETAFEL | [2022/29] | English: | MULTI-COLOR LED PIXEL UNIT AND MICRO-LED DISPLAY PANEL | [2022/29] | French: | UNITÉ DE PIXEL À DEL MULTICOLORE ET PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE À MICRO-DEL | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005012465 (UCHIDA MASAHIRO [JP]); | [XAI]US2015108917 (HAMER JOHN W [US]); | [XY]US2017025567 (LU SHAO-PING [TW], et al); | [Y]US2017069612 (ZHANG LEI [US], et al); | [XI]US2019165207 (KIM CHANG YEON [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US2008268282 (SPINDLER JEFFREY P [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]CN102456841 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102683611 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-17 * description, paragraphs [0041]-[0089] and figures 3-10 *; | [A]CN104681724 (OCEANS KING LIGHTING SCIENCE, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106531772 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN110767670 (YUNGU GUAN TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * description, paragraphs [0071]-[0134] and figures 4-12 * | by applicant | US2005012465 | US2015108917 | US2017025567 | US2017069612 | US2019165207 |