EP4029575 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSU Masanori c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20863603.5 | 27.08.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP32284 | Priority number, date | JP20190164448 | 10.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019164448 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049304 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029575 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/30, A63B69/00, G06F3/01, G06F3/0481 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP);
A61B5/1118 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/1123 (US);
A61B5/7435 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP);
A61B2503/10 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | A63B69/00, G06F3/01, G06F3/0481 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2022/29] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - Pedersen P. ET AL, "Absolute or relative work load in exercise testing--significance of individual differences in working capacity", Scand J Clin Lab Invest ., (19841101), pages 635 - 642, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/6531651, (20220919), XP055962047 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract, Discussion;; figures 1,2 * | [Y] - ROGER ESTON ET AL, "A perceptually regulated, graded exercise test predicts peak oxygen uptake during treadmill exercise in active and sedentary participants", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20120126), vol. 112, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00421-012-2326-8, ISSN 1439-6327, pages 3459 - 3468, XP035110256 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract, Discussion;; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00421-012-2326-8 | International search | [A]JP2011154565 (NINTENDO CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0037]-[0143], fig. 1-11 *; | [XA]JP2013145589 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [X] 1-5,14-20 * paragraphs [0043]-[0074], fig. 1-7 * [A] 6-13; | [A]JP2019046403 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0022]-[0082], fig. 1-7 * | by applicant | JP2017211862 |