EP4033470 - OBJECT DETECTING DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTING SYSTEM, MOVING BODY, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO, Fuko c/o Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
AKIMOTO, Kazumasa c/o Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20864550.7 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020JP34985 | Priority number, date | JP20190170902 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019170902 | [2022/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054341 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033470 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/04, G08G1/16, G06T7/00, G06T7/593 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06T7/97 (CN);
G06T7/70 (CN,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP);
G06T2207/10021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | OBJEKTERFASSUNGSEINRICHTUNG, OBJEKTERFASSUNGSSYSTEM, BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBJEKTERFASSUNG | [2022/30] | English: | OBJECT DETECTING DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTING SYSTEM, MOVING BODY, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECT | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, CORPS MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | Translation filed | 18.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH05265547 (FUJI JUKOGYO KK) [AD] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP2840528 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 6d * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0016] , [0017] , [0027] *; | [A]CN105225482B (UNIV SHANGHAI) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013161241 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12* [ 0 0 1 4 ] - [ 0 0 6 3 ], [ 1 ] - [ 1 1 ] *; | [A]JP2016206801 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * [ 0 0 0 8 ] - [ 0 1 0 1 ], [ 1 ] - [ 2 7 ] *; | [X]WO2017090326 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * [0012]-[0201], [ 1 ] - [ 3 4] *; | [A]WO2017145600 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * [ 0 0 1 1 ] - [ 0 1 7 0 ], [ 1 ] - [ 2 3 ] *; | [A]WO2017145605 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * [ 0 0 1 1 ] - [ 0 1 5 5 ], [ 1 ] - [ 2 3 ] * | by applicant | JPH05265547 |