EP4032949 - PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION AND VINYLCHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwha Solutions Corporation 86, Cheonggyecheon-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04541 / KR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYOO, Sungmin 76, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34128 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jaesong 76, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34128 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yeo Jin 76, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34128 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Yeonran 76, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34128 / KR | 05 /
JANG, Taeyoung 76, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34128 / KR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20864933.5 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020KR12428 | Priority number, date | KR20190113455 | 16.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190113455 | [2022/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054695 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032949 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/10, C08K5/11, C08K5/12, C08K5/132, C08L27/06 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
C08K5/12 (EP,CN,KR);
C08K5/10 (KR);
C08L27/06 (KR,US);
C08K5/0016 (EP,KR);
C08K5/11 (EP,CN);
C08K5/132 (KR);
C08L67/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/11, C08L27/06 (EP,CN);
C08K5/12, C08L27/06 (CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2022/30] | C08K5/10, C08K5/00, C08K5/132, C08K5/12, C08L27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | WEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VINYLCHLORIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2022/30] | English: | PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION AND VINYLCHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME | [2022/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PLASTIFIANT ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE LA COMPRENANT | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | Translation filed | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015124236 (FRESENIUS HEMOCARE NETHERLANDS B V [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP3502175 (ALTRO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0033] * [Y] 1-15; | [E]GB2601454 (ALTRO LTD [GB]) [E] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [A]US2012071598 (GOSSE CLAUDIUS [BE], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 7, 16, 17, 19 and 27. *; | [A]JP2013522293 (EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] 1-15* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20160047221 (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-10. *; | [X]KR20160134573 (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORP [KR]) [X] 1-15 * See claims 1, 3, 4, 6 and 7; paragraphs [0040], [0041] and [0073]; and table 1. *; | [A]KR20180028034 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-9. *; | [A]KR20190024936 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. * | by applicant | KR20080105341 | KR20160047221 | KR101845338B |