EP4024207 - METHOD FOR PLUG-IN IMPLEMENTATION AND SYSTEM FOR PLUG-IN IMPLEMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zhenchao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DING, Chao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TU, Linlin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jinfei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Xiaoxuan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
NING, Weisai Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Zhongling Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 09 /
JIANG, Qinhua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20864942.6 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN107681 | Priority number, date | CN201910883745 | 18.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910883745 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052054 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024207 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F8/71 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/44526 (EP,CN,US);
G06F8/71 (CN,US);
G06F9/44536 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES PLUG-IN UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES PLUG-IN | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD FOR PLUG-IN IMPLEMENTATION AND SYSTEM FOR PLUG-IN IMPLEMENTATION | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPLÉMENTATION D'EXTENSION ET SYSTÈME D'IMPLÉMENTATION D'EXTENSION | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 05.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005132352 (SHEN JAMES ZHONGMING [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11,14 * claim 3 * [I] 3-8,10,12,13,15; | [XI]US2010138547 (KNAPP CHRIS H [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11,14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040]; claim 1 * [I] 3-8,10,12,13,15; | [A]CN105955787 (SHENZHEN VSZONE NETWORK TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract * |