EP4024989 - RESOURCE SCHEDULING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yutang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DENG, Shengchao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HE, Longke Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20864944.2 | 10.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN108130 | Priority number, date | CN201910882641 | 18.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910882641 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052056 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024989 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04B7/0452, H04B7/0456, H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
H04W72/542 (CN,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP);
H04B7/0456 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENPLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/27] | English: | RESOURCE SCHEDULING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION DE RESSOURCES ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | Translation filed | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2018071026 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [XA]US2019260459 (JEON YOUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) |