EP4030111 - BLOWER AND AIR-CONDITIONING INDOOR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Hiroki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
UDA, Masafumi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Sachiko c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
NUNO, Hayato c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
TAKENAKA, Kei c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20865107.5 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP35084 | Priority number, date | JP20190168835 | 17.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019168835 | JP20190198205 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019198205 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054362 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030111 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4030111 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/74, F04D17/04, F24F13/06, F24F13/10, F24F13/20, F24F13/26, F04D29/46, F24F1/0011, F24F1/0057, F24F11/77, F24F11/79 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
F04D29/462 (EP);
F24F1/0007 (CN);
F04D17/04 (EP,US);
F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F1/0018 (CN);
F24F1/0057 (EP);
F24F11/74 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/77 (EP);
F24F11/79 (EP);
F24F13/06 (CN,US);
F24F13/10 (EP,CN,US);
F24F13/20 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | F24F11/74, F04D17/04, F24F13/06, F24F13/10, F24F13/20, F24F13/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBLÄSE UND INNENRAUMEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2022/29] | English: | BLOWER AND AIR-CONDITIONING INDOOR UNIT | [2022/29] | French: | UNITÉ INTÉRIEURE DE SOUFFLANTE ET DE CLIMATISATION | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | Translation filed | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 08.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2762795 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2016067722 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [IY]JP2017138040 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]WO2018029940 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2018103278 (MIDEA GROUP WUHAN REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD [CN], et al) | International search | [A]JPH1019300 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2017138040 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2018185055 (HITACHI JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR CONDITIONING INC) | by applicant | WO2016207946 |