EP4031266 - SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION CATALYST COMPOSITION, CATALYTIC ARTICLE COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE CATALYTIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Mobile Emissions Catalysts LLC 33 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Feng 199 Luqiao Road Shanghai Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jia Di 199 Luqiao Road Shanghai Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Liang 199 Luqiao Road Shanghai Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20865286.7 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020US50789 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN106748 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/106748 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021055299 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031266 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/00, B01J23/00, B01J35/04 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/9418 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,KR);
B01J35/56 (EP);
B01J37/0219 (US);
B01J37/038 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2098 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/55, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/822 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | B01D53/00, B01J23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE KATALYTISCHE REDUKTIONSKATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIESE ENTHALTENDER KATALYTISCHER ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KATALYTISCHEN ARTIKELS | [2022/30] | English: | SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION CATALYST COMPOSITION, CATALYTIC ARTICLE COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE CATALYTIC ARTICLE | [2022/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE, ARTICLE CATALYTIQUE LE COMPRENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE L'ARTICLE CATALYTIQUE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016288094 (MALMBERG STEPHAN [DE], et al); | [X]CN106861674 (DALIAN RUIKE SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN107715892 (CHENGDU XINHUAYUAN SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108114710 (LONGYAN ZIJIN INNOVATION RES INSTITUTE); | [X]WO2019096785 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]); | [X]US2019160428 (CHEN LIANG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US6887825 (BRAZDIL JAMES F [US]); | [A]US9789468 (KIM HONG DAE [KR], et al); | [A]CN107715892 (CHENGDU XINHUAYUAN SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2018304236 (ZHAO FENG [CN], et al); | [X]WO2019096785 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) |