EP3925442 - AUTOMATIC BEE SEPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeong, Hyuk 11-2 Nammun-ro 622beon-gil Dong-gu Gwangju 61498 / KR | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20865703.1 | 21.09.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020KR12691 | Priority number, date | KR20190116107 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190116107 | [2021/51] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054795 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925442 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K57/00, A01K59/00, A01K55/00, A01K59/02 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A01K59/00 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A01K57/00 (IL,KR);
A01K47/06 (CN,US);
A01K47/00 (CN);
A01K55/00 (EP,GB);
A01K59/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A01K57/00, A01K59/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE BIENENTRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/51] | English: | AUTOMATIC BEE SEPARATION DEVICE | [2021/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION AUTOMATIQUE D'ABEILLES | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | Translation filed | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]KR20140007722 (PARK JUNG SOO [KR]) [Y] 3,4,7 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5,6; | [A]KR20140059538 (KIM HYUN SOO [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]KR200475229Y (KIM C H; KIM H D) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XY]KR20160101621 (JANG JAE WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025]; figure - * [Y] 2-4,7; | [YA]KR20180054182 (LEE MI OK [KR]) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-7 | International search | [A]US4776051 (SYME RAYMOND J [NZ]) [A] 1-7 * See column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 35 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20120045211 (BAK NAM SU [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0011] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20140059538 (KIM HYUN SOO [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0048] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101908051B (LEE, Mi-Ok) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0083] and figures 1-5. *; | [PX]KR102093334B (JEONG HYUK [KR]) [PX] 1-7 * See claims 1-6. ** ("This document is a published earlier application that serves as a basis for claiming priority of the present international application.") *; | [XA] - Daehan Beekeeping, "Automatic Stripping Machine / Beekeeping Machine", (20180504), pages 1 - 3, Naver Blogger Daehan Beekeeping, URL: https://blog.naver.com/PostView.nhn?blogId=govl0023&logNo=221268372816&categoryNo=66&parentCategoryNo=&from=thumbnailList, (20201221), XP009526991 [X] 1,5-7 * See entire video. * [A] 2-4 | by applicant | KR200460083Y |