EP4095917 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Yue No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
QIU, Yuanyou No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Weiyun No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Yao No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20866970.5 | 23.01.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020CN73993 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021147081 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095917 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H10K59/121 (EP);
H10K77/10 (KR);
H10K59/1315 (US);
H10K50/11 (KR);
H10K50/813 (KR);
H10K50/82 (KR);
H10K59/1213 (KR,US);
H10K59/1216 (KR);
H10K59/123 (EP,KR);
H10K59/124 (KR);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR);
H10K59/60 (KR);
H10K59/65 (KR);
H10K71/00 (KR);
H01L27/124 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/48] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/48] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | Translation filed | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN110047846 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD); | [XAY]CN110189639 (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]CN110492018 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD); | [XY]US2019393286 (DING LIWEI [CN], et al); | US2021327958 [ ] (LI MEIJIN [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2013087770 (SON JUNG HYUN [KR], et al); | [A]CN109064904 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]CN109981855 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN110061038 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]CN110061014 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]CN110675744 (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) |