EP4034888 - AIRCRAFT AIRFLOW SENSOR HAVING A VANE WITH INTEGRATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerosonic LLC 1212 North Hercules Avenue Clearwater, FL 33765 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states Aerosonic Corporation 1212 North Hercules Avenue Clearwater, FL 33765 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INMAN, Matthew 1212 N. Hercules Ave. Clearwater, Florida 33765 / US | 02 /
PATE, Steven 1212 N. Hercules Ave. Clearwater, Florida 33765 / US | 03 /
MORICH, Robert 1212 N. Hercules Ave. Clearwater, Florida 33765 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20867025.7 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US52639 | Priority number, date | US201962906388P | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962906388 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062097 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034888 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/165, G01P13/02, B64D43/02, B64D15/12 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01P5/165 (EP,KR);
G01P13/02 (US);
B64D15/12 (EP,KR,US);
B64D43/02 (EP,KR);
G01P1/026 (KR,US);
G01P13/025 (EP,KR);
G01P5/16 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | G01P5/165, B64D43/02, G01P5/14, G01P13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUG-LUFTSTROMSENSOR, DER EINE SCHAUFEL MIT INTEGRIERTEN DRUCKWANDLERN AUFWEIST | [2022/31] | English: | AIRCRAFT AIRFLOW SENSOR HAVING A VANE WITH INTEGRATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCERS | [2022/31] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ÉCOULEMENT D'AIR D'AÉRONEF AYANT UNE AUBE AVEC DES TRANSDUCTEURS DE PRESSION INTÉGRÉS | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0167115 (ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC [US]); | [XI]FR2847673 (THALES SA [FR]); | [XYI]CN102298071 ; | [X]US2016356175 (WADDINGTON ALAN [GB]); | [XYI]US2017199218 (BENNING KEVIN [US]); | [XI]CN107843281 (XIE XIAOJUN) | International search | [Y]WO0167115 (ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC [US]) [Y] 7, 8, 17, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2006008345 (PONZIANI ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2006086184 (COLLOT LIONEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2016356175 (WADDINGTON ALAN [GB]) [X] 1-6, 9-16, 18, 19 * entire document * [Y] 7, 8, 17, 20 | by applicant | WO0167115 | FR2847673 | CN102298071 | US2016356175 | US2017199218 | CN107843281 |