EP4035351 - METHOD FOR ACCESS UNIT DELIMITER SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byeongdoo c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
WENGER, Stephan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20867667.6 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US51973 | Priority number, date | US201962904361P | 23.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962904361 P | US202017023711 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: US202017023711 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021061629 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035351 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/169 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR,US);
H04N19/159 (KR,US);
H04N19/174 (KR,US);
H04N19/188 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | H04N7/12, H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEGRENZUNGSSIGNALISIERUNG EINER ZUGRIFFSEINHEIT | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR ACCESS UNIT DELIMITER SIGNALING | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SIGNALISATION DE DÉLIMITEUR D'UNITÉ D'ACCÈS | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2016044309 (CHOI BYEONG-DOO [KR], et al) [I] 1,9-12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0100] - [0110] * [A] 2-8; | [IP] - CHOI (TENCENT) B ET AL, "AHG17: Parameters in AUD", no. JVET-P0222, (20190926), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0222-v2.zip JVET-P0222_Parameters in AUD.docx, (20190926), XP030216622 [IP] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - HANNUKSELA (NOKIA) M M, "Version 1/MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: Access unit boundary detection", no. JCT3V-G0032, (20131219), 7. JCT-3V MEETING; 20140111 - 20140117; SAN JOSE; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct2/doc_end_user/documents/7_San%20Jose/wg11/JCT3V-G0032-v1.zip JCTVC-P0043_JCT3V-G0032.doc, (20140113), XP030131775 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2010208792 (WIEGAND THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-20* , entire document, *; | [A]US2015237356 (WU YONGJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document, (especially abstract). *; | [X]US2015381991 (WANG YE-KUI [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * , entire document, (especially abstract, para [0009], [0022], [0032] [0043], [0062], [0067], [0086]-[0087]. [0099]-[0100], [0118], [0136]-[0138]). * |