EP4036444 - SPOOL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Naoki 1058585 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
KAWATO, Tadanobu 1058587 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
HOSHI, Masaki 1058587 Tokyo / JP | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20868996.8 | 17.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020JP35283 | Priority number, date | JP20190172708 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019172708 | [2022/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021060146 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036444 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/24, F16K47/08, F16K3/26, F16K11/07, F16K27/04, F15B13/08 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
F16K3/26 (EP);
F16K47/08 (CN);
F16K27/041 (EP,US);
F15B13/0402 (EP);
F16K11/07 (US);
F16K11/0716 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | F16K3/24, F16K47/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SPULENVENTIL | [2022/31] | English: | SPOOL VALVE | [2022/31] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR À TIROIR | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2022 | Translation filed | 01.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007267078 (COLLET OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [A]JP4100161B ; | [XD]JP2011017381 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]US2017314700 (IWANAGA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019102909 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2019143781 (EAGLE IND CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2011017381 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]JP2012522201 ; | [A]JP2015102150 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2018013184 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2009236310 |