EP4038154 - REVERSE PHOTOCHROMIC INKS, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS AND WRITING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanford, L.P. 6655 Peachtree Dunwoody Road Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZAPLEWSKI, Kenneth 519 Hamilton Avenue Westmont, Illinois 60559 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Roberts, David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20869275.6 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020US52196 | Priority number, date | US201962904889P | 24.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962904889 P | US201962904900P | 24.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962904900 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021061757 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038154 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/17, C09D11/32, C09D11/50, C09D11/18 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
C09D11/18 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
C09D11/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | C09D11/17, C09D11/32, C09D11/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | UMGEKEHRTE PHOTOCHROME TINTEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN UND SCHREIBGERÄTE | [2022/32] | English: | REVERSE PHOTOCHROMIC INKS, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS AND WRITING INSTRUMENTS | [2022/32] | French: | ENCRES PHOTOCHROMIQUES INVERSES, PROCÉDÉS ET INSTRUMENTS D'ÉCRITURE ASSOCIÉS | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH0228683 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,6,10,11; | [XI]US5593486 (OLIVER JOHN F [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column 45, line 33 - line 39 * * column 49, line 35 - line 39 * * examples * [I] 6,10-12; | [XI]US2008162162 (REICHELSHEIMER JAY [US]) [X] 1,3,7-9,12 * claims; examples; figures; paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * [I] 2,4-6,10,11; | [XI]US2009322070 (REICHELSHEIMER JAY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,12 * claims; paragraphs [0023] , [0 30]; figure 3 * [I] 2,4,6,10,11; | [XI]JP2010270163 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 10,13-15; | [A] - AIKEN STUART ET AL, "Negatively photochromic organic compounds: Exploring the dark side", DYES AND PIGMENTS, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BARKING, GB, (20170927), vol. 149, doi:10.1016/J.DYEPIG.2017.09.057, ISSN 0143-7208, pages 92 - 121, XP085306287 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dyepig.2017.09.057 | International search | [A]US2006053975 (SHIBAHASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 17-24 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0007], para [0009], para [0012], para [0072], para [0074], para [0113] *; | [A]US2008085384 (YLITALO CAROLINE M [US], et al) [A] 17-24 * ; para [0006], para [0029], para [0033], para [0093], para [0094] *; | [Y]US2012038718 (KAZMAIER PETER M [CA], et al) [Y] 26-29 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0003], para [0016], para [0017] *; | [XYA]US2016024321 (WANG YONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-15, 25, 30 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0011]. para [0018], para [0033], para [0035], para [0065], para [0066] * [Y] 26-29 [A] 16-24; | [A]US2017058139 (CLAYTON TERRILL SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-30* ; entire document, but especially: para [0016], para [0052], para [0125]- para [0128] *; | [A]US2019284406 (LEVINE ANDREW SETH [US], et al) [A] 16 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0003], para [0016], para [0017] *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Tinuvin 477-DW Technical Data Sheet", Tinuvin 477-DW Technical Data Sheet, (20101201), pages 1 - 3, XP055243922 [A] 19 * ; page 1 * |