EP3913732 - BATTERY PACK, VEHICLE, AND CONTROL METHOD FOR MITIGATING SPREAD OF THERMAL RUNAWAY OF BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, EE, ES, MC, SK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Xiaoteng No.2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HONG, Jiarong No.2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wenli No.2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
XIANG, Yanhuo No.2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
HUANG, Xiaoteng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
HONG, Jiarong Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Wenli Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
XIANG, Yanhuo Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20869350.7 | 07.08.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN107773 | Priority number, date | CN201910914629 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910914629 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057280 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913732 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913732 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/20, H01M10/613, A62C3/07, A62C3/16, H01M10/42, H01M50/342, A62C35/02 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A62C3/16 (EP,CN);
H01M10/6568 (CN,US);
A62C3/07 (EP);
A62C35/023 (EP);
A62C35/026 (EP);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L58/24 (US);
H01M10/4207 (EP);
H01M10/613 (CN,US);
H01M10/625 (US);
H01M10/651 (US);
H01M50/3425 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | H01M50/20, H01M10/613 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK, FAHRZEUG UND STEUERVERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER AUSBREITUNG DES THERMISCHEN ABLAUFS EINES AKKUPACKS | [2021/47] | English: | BATTERY PACK, VEHICLE, AND CONTROL METHOD FOR MITIGATING SPREAD OF THERMAL RUNAWAY OF BATTERY PACK | [2021/47] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR LIMITER LA PROPAGATION DE L'EMBALLEMENT THERMIQUE DU BLOC-BATTERIE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2021 | Translation filed | 17.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | LU | 07.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN107398049 (ZHEFU INTELLIGENT SYSTEM SHANGHAI CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN108075084 (SINOEV HEFEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052] ** figures 1,2 * |