EP4037037 - CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U&S Energy, Inc. D-dong, 52, 4sandan 3-ro, Jiksan-eup Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31040 / KR | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyung Joon Dunsan-Dong, GukHwa Apt.,) 203dong 1009ho, 201, Dunsan-ro, Seo-gu Daejeon 35245 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Seung Ho WonShinHeung-Dong, OullimHeart) 1201dong 1103ho 725, Dongseo-daero, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34195 / KR | 03 /
JIN, Young Hun Geumam-dong, Woorim Lumi Art Apt.,) 106dong 201ho 75, Jangan-ro Gyeryong-si Chungcheongnam-do 32825 / KR | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20870243.1 | 07.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020KR12021 | Priority number, date | KR20190117356 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190117356 | [2022/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021060742 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037037 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M4/26, H01M10/42, H01M10/0587, H01M4/02 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M10/0587 (KR);
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR);
H01M4/26 (KR);
H01M4/661 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/668 (EP,US);
H01M4/669 (KR);
H01M50/528 (CN);
H01M50/533 (EP);
H01M50/534 (EP);
H01M50/536 (EP);
H01M50/566 (US);
H01M50/581 (CN,KR);
H01M50/583 (EP);
H01M50/586 (CN);
H01M50/593 (CN);
H01M2004/028 (KR);
H01M2200/10 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | KATHODENSTROMABNEHMER | [2022/31] | English: | CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR | [2022/31] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT DE CATHODE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | Translation filed | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006105243 (OKAMURA TAKAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009187675 (SHARP KK); | [I]US10164263 (KIM CHANG HYEON [KR], et al); | [XI]CN208433466U (SHENZHEN QIANHAI YOURONG TECH INC); | [E]EP3832764 (U & S ENERGY INC [KR]) | International search | [A]JPH10302753 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [Y]KR20060068426 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2012049109 (UNIV QINGHUA, et al); | [A]KR20130126107 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [YX]KR20140131115 (SHINE CO LTD [KR]) |