EP4012986 - COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR HYBRID NETWORK, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yuefeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TAN, Jiajie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YU, Qi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/24] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20870510.3 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CN117460 | Priority number, date | CN201910945133 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910945133 | [2022/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021063244 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012986 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4012986 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/02, H04L45/52, H04L45/00, H04L61/5007, H04L61/5092, H04L12/64, H04L9/40, H04L12/66, H04L101/622 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04L61/5092 (EP);
H04L12/64 (EP,CN);
H04L69/323 (US);
H04B3/54 (CN);
H04L12/66 (EP,CN);
H04L43/10 (US);
H04L45/026 (EP);
H04L45/66 (EP);
H04L61/2503 (US);
H04L61/50 (US);
H04L61/5007 (EP);
H04L61/5046 (US);
H04L63/08 (CN);
H04L63/0876 (EP);
H04L63/162 (EP);
H04L9/0841 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/3268 (EP);
H04L2012/6416 (CN);
H04L2012/6448 (CN);
H04L2101/622 (EP);
H04L2101/659 (EP,CN,US);
H04L2101/677 (EP);
H04L45/52 (EP);
H04L45/748 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | H04L61/5007, H04L61/5092, H04L12/64, H04L9/40, H04L12/66 | ||
Former IPC [2022/24] | H04L12/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN HYBRIDES NETZWERK, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2022/24] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR HYBRID NETWORK, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION POUR RÉSEAU HYBRIDE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | Translation filed | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2099171 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,11 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * [A] 2-6,8-10,12-15; | [A]EP2490469 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * |