EP4042859 - SCALE FOR A GRAIN SCREEN, ADJUSTABLE GRAIN SCREEN AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING SCALES FOR A GRAIN SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindenmayr Döwich, Marta Rua lagoa Ibirapuera n 425, Paraná 85817-830 Cascavel / BR | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWICH, Gerhard Avenida Capitão Balbino, n° 579, Rio Grande do Sul 98390-000 Erval Seco / BR | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | JWP Patent & Trademark Attorneys ul. Minska 75 03-828 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Mlynarska, Paulina Emma JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.k. Sienna Center Ul. Zelazna 28/30 PL-00-833 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 20870770.3 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020BR50389 | Priority number, date | BR20191020537 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: BR102019020537 | [2022/33] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062505 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | PT | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042859 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/44, A01D41/127 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A01F12/448 (EP,US);
A01F12/446 (BR);
A01D41/1276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | SKALA FÜR EIN KORNSIEB, EINSTELLBARES KORNSIEB, UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN VON SKALEN FÜR EIN KORNSIEB | [2022/33] | English: | SCALE FOR A GRAIN SCREEN, ADJUSTABLE GRAIN SCREEN AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING SCALES FOR A GRAIN SCREEN | [2022/33] | French: | LAME POUR TAMIS À GRAINS, TAMIS RÉGLABLE POUR GRAINS ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE LAMES POUR TAMIS À GRAINS | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | Translation filed | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]RU2613456 (KLAUZER LEONID ALEKSANDROVICH [RU]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018103589 (MESCHKE MICHAEL T [IL]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019059234 (MAMMEN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XA]US2019082597 (MANEY JEFFREY HARRIS [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * [A] 2-4; | [A]EP3527063 (CNH IND BELGIUM NV [BE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [X]BRMU8403321U (ADILO BAUER EPP [BR]) [X] 1* Description (pag. 3/3, lines 64-65); Figure 8. *; | [X]BR102018068431 (HCC INC [US]) [X] 1 * Paragraphs [0015-0017]; Figures 3-6. * | by applicant | CN203661659U | US9699971 | WO2018053897 |