EP4037553 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VASCULAR AND STRUCTURAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaze Bioscience, Inc. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVAK, Julia c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 02 /
KOLLER, Teri Dee c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 03 /
PERRY, Jeffrey c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 04 /
KITTLE, David c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 05 /
BUTTE, Pramod c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 06 /
MILLER, Dennis c/o BLAZE BIOSCIENCE, INC. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1400 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20871919.5 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020US53746 | Priority number, date | US201962909397P | 02.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962909397 P | US201962950865P | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962950865 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067563 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037553 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B1/04, A61B1/06, A61B1/247, A61B6/00, A61B9/00, G02B21/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61B1/043 (EP);
A61B5/0071 (EP,US);
A61B1/000094 (EP);
A61B1/046 (EP);
A61B1/063 (EP);
A61B1/0638 (EP);
A61B1/0655 (EP);
A61B5/0035 (US);
A61B5/0036 (US);
A61B5/0066 (EP);
A61B5/0082 (US);
A61B5/02007 (US);
A61B5/0261 (US);
G02B21/06 (EP,US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G02B21/36 (EP,US);
G02B27/1006 (EP,US);
G02B27/30 (EP,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP);
A61B1/0646 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | A61B5/00, A61B1/04, A61B1/06, A61B1/247, A61B6/00, A61B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VASKULÄREN UND STRUKTURELLEN BILDGEBUNG | [2022/32] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VASCULAR AND STRUCTURAL IMAGING | [2022/32] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES D'IMAGERIE VASCULAIRE ET STRUCTURALE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016206202 (FRANGIONI JOHN V [US]); | [X]US2016287081 (YANG CHUNXIN [US], et al); | [XP]WO2019191497 (BLAZE BIOSCIENCE INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2005182321 (FRANGIONI JOHN V [US]) [A] 1-4 * entire document *; | [A]US2016096869 (HANSEN STACEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * entire document *; | [A]US2016277687 (LEE BYEONG IL [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * entire document *; | [X]US2016287081 (YANG CHUNXIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * entire document *; | [A]US2018270474 (LIU YANG [US]) [A] 1-4* entire document * | by applicant | US2016287081 |