EP4040063 - RESIDUAL VALUE CALCULATION SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/32] | REMAINING VALUE CALCULATION SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER AND ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER | ||
[2024/34] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - German title | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - English title | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - French title | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Chikara c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
NARIKIYO, Yasutaka c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20872330.4 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020JP36825 | Priority number, date | JP20190180443 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019180443 | JP20190180444 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019180444 | [2022/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021065882 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040063 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4040063 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/30, G06Q30/06 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/62 (US);
F24F11/63 (EP,CN);
F24F11/70 (US);
G06Q10/063 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESTWERTBERECHNUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KLIMAANLAGE | [2024/34] | English: | RESIDUAL VALUE CALCULATION SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER | [2024/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CALCUL DE VALEUR RESTANTE POUR CLIMATISEUR | [2024/34] |
Former [2022/32] | RESTWERTBERECHNUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KLIMAANLAGE UND ASSISTENZSYSTEM FÜR KLIMAANLAGE | ||
Former [2022/32] | REMAINING VALUE CALCULATION SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER AND ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR AIR CONDITIONER | ||
Former [2022/32] | SYSTÈME DE CALCUL DE VALEUR RESTANTE POUR CLIMATISEUR ET SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE POUR CLIMATISEUR | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | Translation filed | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001182991 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [XI]JP2001195448 (SHARP KK); | [A]US2003070438 (KIKUCHI HIROSHIGE [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005265286 (IDEMITSU GAS & LIFE CO LTD); | [A]US2009182455 (LIAO SHIUE-JUAN [TW], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2001182991 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [XY]JP2001195448 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2005265286 (IDEMITSU GAS & LIFE CO LTD); | [A]JP2006350610 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]WO2015145979 (NEC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2015141600 |