EP4038369 - METHODS FOR QUANTIFICATION OF CARBOHYDRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biological E Limited 18/1 & 3 Azamabad Telangana, Hyderabad 500020 / IN | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKI, Rajendar c/o Biological E. Ltd., Plot No. 18/1 & 3, Azamabad Hyderabad, Telangana 500020 / IN | 02 /
MATUR, Ramesh Venkat c/o Biological E. Ltd., Plot No. 18/1 & 3, Azamabad Hyderabad, Telangana 500020 / IN | 03 /
MANTENA, Narender Dev c/o Biological E. Ltd., Plot No. 18/1 & 3, Azamabad Hyderabad, Telangana 500020 / IN | 04 /
DATLA, Mahima c/o Biological E. Ltd., Plot No. 18/1 & 3, Azamabad Hyderabad, Telangana 500020 / IN | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20872366.8 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020IN50841 | Priority number, date | IN201941039796 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: IN201941039796 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064748 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038369 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31, G01N21/78, G01N31/22, // G01N33/15 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01N31/22 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/31 (KR,US);
G01N21/78 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | G01N21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON KOHLENHYDRATEN | [2022/32] | English: | METHODS FOR QUANTIFICATION OF CARBOHYDRATES | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE QUANTIFICATION DE GLUCIDES | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 19.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2015132831 (OLINSKI ROBERT PIOTR [DK], et al); | International search | [A]UA23879U (MALYNOVSKYI YURII YURIIOVYCH [UA], et al) [A] 1-12* Abstract *; | [X] - Wu T., Wang C., Wang X., Ma Q., "Simultaneous determination of 21 preservatives in cosmetics by ultra performance liquid chromatography", International Journal of Cosmetic Science, (20081000), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 367 - 372, XP055811534 [X] 13, 14 * Synopsis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1468-2494.2008.00465.x | [A] - S. Suzanne Nielsen , "Phenol-sulfuric acid method for total carbohydrates.", S. Suzanne Nielsen , S. Suzanne Nielsen, Food Analysis Laboratory Manual, Boston, MA, Springer New York, NY, (20091126), pages 47 - 53, doi:10.1007/978-1-4419-1463-7, ISBN 978-1-4419-1463-7, XP009535344 [A] 1-12 * Abstract, introduction, and procedure * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4419-1463-7 | by applicant | IN5856DELNP2009 | EP2290366 | WO2016174683 | - PHILIPPE et al., Vaccine, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 2474 - 2484 | - VINCENT et al., Anal. Chem., (20100000), vol. 82, pages 1786 - 1792 | - VERONICA et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (20120000), vol. 421, pages 250 - 255 | - EARL ZABLACKIS et al., Vaccine Analysis: Strategies, Principles, and Control, (20150000), pages 271 - 299 |