EP4018669 - POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE, POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION DEVICE, AND POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUR, Hyejung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
OH, Sejin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20872595.2 | 05.10.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020KR13491 | Priority number, date | US201962910398P | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910398 P | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066615 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018669 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, H04N19/54, H04N19/137, H04N19/109, G06T9/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (CN,KR);
H04N19/105 (CN,KR);
G06F18/2113 (US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T19/006 (CN);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T9/00 (KR);
G06T9/004 (EP);
G06T9/40 (US);
H04N21/2343 (CN,KR);
G06T2207/10028 (KR);
G06V2201/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | PUNKTWOLKENDATENSENDEVORRICHTUNG, PUNKTWOLKENDATENSENDEVERFAHREN, PUNKTWOLKENDATENEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND PUNKTWOLKENDATENEMPFANGSVERFAHREN | [2022/26] | English: | POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE, POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION DEVICE, AND POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION METHOD | [2022/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019080483 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al) [A] 4,9; | [A]US2019087979 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0087], [0402]; claim 1; and figure 1 *; | [A]US2019116372 (COHEN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0005]-[0017]; and claims 1-6 *; | [Y] - Khaled Mammon, Philip A. Chou, David Flynn, Maj a Krivokuca, Ohji Nakagami, Toshiyasu Sugio, "G-PCC codec description", 125. MPEG meeting; 20190114 - 20190118; Marrakech; (Motion Picture Expert Group or ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), (20190222), no. N18189, pages 1 - 39, XP030212734 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * sections 3.6.6-3.6.7 * | [A] - Schwarz Sebastian; Preda Marius; Baroncini Vittorio; Budagavi Madhukar; Cesar Pablo; Chou Philip A.; Cohen Robert A.; Krivokuca Maja; Lasserre Sebastien; Li Zhu; Llach Joan; Mammou Khaled; Mekuria Rufael; Nakagami Ohji; Siahaan Ernestasia; Tabatabai Ali; Tourapis Alexis M.; Zakharchenko Vladyslav, "Emerging MPEG Standards for Point Cloud Compression", IEEE Journal on Emerging and Selected Topics in Circuits and Systems, IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, USA, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (20190330), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JETCAS.2018.2885981, ISSN 2156-3357, pages 133 - 148, XP011714044 [A] 1-15 * pages 136-140 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JETCAS.2018.2885981 |