EP4037514 - A HYGIENE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woolchemy NZ Limited 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt 5018 / NZ | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTROZ-SMITH, Derelee 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt, 5018 / NZ | 02 /
ROGERS, Alistair c\- Woolchemy NZ Limited 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt, 5018 / NZ | 03 /
RATHOD, Manoj c\- Woolchemy NZ Limited 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt, 5018 / NZ | 04 /
NEILL, Steven c\- Woolchemy NZ Limited 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt, 5018 / NZ | 05 /
JUNAID, Fadi c\- Woolchemy NZ Limited 5 Twin Lakes Road Te Marua Upper Hutt, 5018 / NZ | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20872597.8 | 02.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020NZ50120 | Priority number, date | NZ20200197578 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: NZ 19757820 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066663 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037514 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A41B17/00, A61F13/53, D04H5/00, D04H1/00, A61F13/537 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A61F5/4401 (EP,KR);
A41B17/00 (EP,AU,KR);
D04H1/4266 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/537 (EP,KR,US);
A41B13/00 (AU,KR);
A41B15/00 (AU,KR);
A41B9/00 (AU,KR);
A41D13/0002 (AU,KR);
A41D31/125 (EP,KR);
A61F13/15252 (KR,US);
A61F13/53 (EP,AU);
A61F5/01 (AU);
B32B9/02 (AU,KR);
B32B9/047 (AU,KR);
D04H1/4258 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/5412 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/55 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/58 (EP,KR,US);
D04H5/00 (AU,KR);
A41B2400/62 (EP,KR);
A41B2500/30 (EP,AU,KR);
A41D2500/30 (EP,AU,KR);
A61F2013/530131 (EP);
A61F2013/530386 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | A41B17/00, A61F13/53, D04H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | HYGIENEARTIKEL | [2022/32] | English: | A HYGIENE ARTICLE | [2022/32] | French: | ARTICLE D'HYGIÈNE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003119407 (ERIKSEN MARIANNE ETLAR [DK], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0035] - [0037] - [0043] , [0044]; claims 1-10 *; | [XYI]GB2396360 (JOHN COTTON GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,6,8 * page 5, paragraphs first, last * * claims 25-29 * [Y] 9-15 [I] 2,4,5,7; | [X]US2014017504 (FROST GEORGE W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8* paragraphs [0026] , [0033] , [0060]; claims 1-11 * | International search | [X]US3025187 (SMITH BELL ANGUS, et al) [X] 1-37 * Column 1, line 18, column 6, lines 15-20, Examples 1, 8-12 *; | [X]US5514080 (BLOTT PATRICK L [GB], et al) [X] 1-37* Abstract, column 1, lines 11-33, Example 1, column 13, lines 7-11 *; | [X]US2003119407 (ERIKSEN MARIANNE ETLAR [DK], et al) [X] 1-37 * Abstract, para. [0002], [0021]-[0023], [0035]-[0037], [0043]-[0044] *; | [X]CN205072079U (ZHU YUZHEN) [X] 1-37 * , English Abstract retrieved from Espacenet English Abstract and description page 1 retrieved from Espacenet and Google Patent * |