EP4043553 - METHOD FOR ISOLATING URETERIC BUD TIP CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSAFUNE, Kenji c/o Kyoto University, 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
MAE, Shinichi c/o Kyoto University, 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 03 /
RYOSAKA, Makoto c/o Kyoto University, 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20872677.8 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP37329 | Priority number, date | JP20190181593 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019181593 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066076 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043553 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071, C12Q1/02 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP);
C12N5/0684 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N5/0697 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/02 (KR);
G01N33/5005 (CN);
G01N33/56966 (CN,US);
C12N2501/11 (CN,US);
C12N2501/113 (CN,KR,US);
C12N2501/119 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N2501/15 (EP,CN);
C12N2501/155 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/16 (US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/727 (CN,KR);
C12N2501/998 (CN);
C12N2501/999 (US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N2333/47 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ISOLIEREN VON URETERKNOTENZELLEN | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD FOR ISOLATING URETERIC BUD TIP CELLS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ISOLER DES CELLULES D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE BOURGEON URÉTÉRIQUE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | Translation filed | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014066649 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-19 *; | [XY]WO2019098349 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [0031] - [0051]; claims 1-22 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y] - RUTLEDGE ELISABETH A ET AL, "Cellular heterogeneity in the ureteric progenitor niche and distinct profiles of branching morphogenesis in organ development.", DEVELOPMENT (CAMBRIDGE, ENGLAND) 01 09 2017, (20170901), vol. 144, no. 17, ISSN 1477-9129, pages 3177 - 3188, XP055811444 [Y] 1-15 * page 3178, column 1, paragraph last; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.149112 | [Y] - TAGUCHI ATSUHIRO ET AL, "Higher-Order Kidney Organogenesis from Pluripotent Stem Cells", CELL STEM CELL, ELSEVIER, CELL PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20171109), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.STEM.2017.10.011, ISSN 1934-5909, page 730, XP085301486 [Y] 1-15 * page 732, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2017.10.011 | [Y] - YUN XIA ET AL, "Directed differentiation of human pluripotent cells to ureteric bud kidney progenitor-like cells", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, London, (20131117), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:10.1038/ncb2872, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 1507 - 1515, XP055461411 [Y] 1-15 * page 1508, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb2872 | International search | [YA]JP2006312638 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY, et al) [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * paragraph [0089] paragraph [0089] * [A] 18-25; | [Y]US2011008892 (NIGAM SANJAY KUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * paragraphs [0046], [0048] *; | [YA]US2015284689 (NIGAM SANJAY K [US]) [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * paragraphs [0008]-[0009] paragraphs [0008]-[0009] * [A] 18-25; | [A]JP2017537655 (THE UNIVERSITY OF QUEENSLAND) [A] 1-28 * claims, examples *; | [A]JP2018183137 (UNIV KUMAMOTO) [A] 1-28 * claims, examples *; | [XYA] - RUTLEDGE, Elisabeth A. et al., "Cellular heterogeneity in the ureteric progenitor niche and distinct profiles of branching morphogenesis in organ development", Development, (20170000), vol. 144, doi:10.1242/dev.149112, pages 3177 - 3188, XP055811444 [X] 27-28 * fig. 3 fig. 3 fig. 3 * [Y] 1-17, 26-28 [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.149112 | [YA] - MAE, SHINICHI et al., "Generation of branching ureteric bud tissues from human pluripotent stem cells", Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20180000), vol. 495, doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2017.11.105, pages 954 - 961, XP055609767 [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * abstract, page 958, right column, "3.4. Generation of branching UB tissue", fig. 3, 4 abstract, page 958, right column, "3.4. Generation of branching UB tissue", fig. 3, 4 * [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2017.11.105 | [YA] - YURI, Shunsuke et al., "In vitro propagation and branching morphogenesis from single ureteric bud cells", Stem Cell Reports, (20170000), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.stemcr.2016.12.011, pages 401 - 416, XP055609758 [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * page 403, left column, "R-Spondin Mediates the Effect of WNT-beta-Catenin Signaling in UB Cells", page 406, right column, "Propagation and Reconstruction of UB-like Structure from Single UB Cells" page 403, left column, "R-Spondin Mediates the Effect of WNT-beta-Catenin Signaling in UB Cells", page 406, right column, "Propagation and Reconstruction of UB-like Structure from Single UB Cells" * [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stemcr.2016.12.011 | [YA] - BUSH, Kevin T, Sakurai Hiroyuki, Steer Dylan L, Leonard Martin O, Sampogna Rosemary V, Meyer Tobias N, Schwesinger Catherine, Qiao Jizeng, Nigam Sanjay K, "TGF- beta superfamily members modulate growth, branching, shaping, and patterning of the ureteric bud", Dev. Biol., (20040000), vol. 266, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ydbio.2003.10.023, pages 285 - 298, XP055811456 [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * page 290, left column, line 1 to right column, line 9 page 290, left column, line 1 to right column, line 9 * [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2003.10.023 | [YA] - GUI, Ting; Sun Yujing; Gai Zhibo; Shimokado Aiko; Muragaki Yasuteru; Zhou Gengyin, "The loss of Trps1 suppresses ureteric bud branching because of the activation of TGF-beta signaling", Dev. Biol., (20130000), vol. 377, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ydbio.2013.03.014, pages 415 - 427, XP028590005 [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * fig. 8 fig. 8 * [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2013.03.014 | [YA] - CHI, Lijun, Saarela Ulla, Railo Antti, Prunskaite-Hyyryläinen Renata, Skovorodkin Ilya, Anthony Shelagh, Katsu Kenjiro, Liu Yu, Shan Jingdong, Salgueiro Ana Marisa, Belo José António, Davies Jamie, Yokouchi Yuji, Vainio Seppo J., "A secreted EMP antagonist, Cer1, fine tunes the spatial organization of the ureteric bud tree during mouse kidney development", PLOS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, no. issue 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0027676, pages 1 - 16, XP055811462 [Y] 1-17, 26-28 * fig. 2 fig. 2 * [A] 18-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0027676 | [PX] - MAE, Shin-Ichi, Ryosaka Makoto, Sakamoto Satoko, Matsuse Kyoko, Nozaki Aya, Igami Maiko, Kabai Ryotaro, Watanabe Akira, Osafune Kenji, "Expansion of human iPSC-derived ureteric bud organoid, with repeated branching potential", Cell Reports, (20200728), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2020.107963, pages 1 - 16, XP055811473 [PX] 1-28 * abstract, fig. 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2020.107963 | by applicant | US4326055 | US5234926 | WO2007069666 | WO2009146408 | WO2011007900 | WO2019098349 | JP2019181593 | - OSAFUNE K. et al., Development, (20060000), vol. 133, pages 151 - 161 | - KOBAYASHI A. et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20080000), vol. 3, pages 169 - 181 | - TAGUCHI A. et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20140000), vol. 14, pages 53 - 67 | - J. A. THOMSON et al., Science, (19980000), vol. 282, pages 1145 - 1147 | - J. A. THOMSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 7844 - 7848 | - J. A. THOMSON et al., Biol. Reprod., (19960000), vol. 55, pages 254 - 259 | - J. A. THOMSONV. S. MARSHALL, Curr. Top. Dev. Biol., (19980000), vol. 38, pages 133 - 165 | - T. WAKAYAMA et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 292, pages 740 - 743 | - S. WAKAYAMA et al., Biol. Reprod., (20050000), vol. 72, pages 932 - 936 | - J. BYRNE, Nature, (20070000), vol. 450, pages 497 - 502 | - M. KANATSU-SHINOHARA et al., Biol. Reprod., (20030000), vol. 69, pages 612 - 616 | - K. SHINOHARA et al., Cell, (20040000), vol. 119, pages 1001 - 1012 | - Y. MATSUI, Cell, (19920000), vol. 70, pages 841 - 847 | - J. L. RESNICK et al., Nature, (19920000), vol. 359, pages 550 - 551 | - K. TAKAHASHIS. YAMANAKA, Cell, (20060000), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - K. TAKAHASHI et al., Cell, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - J. YU et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1917 - 1920 | - NAKAGAWA, M. et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 26, pages 101 - 106 | - Annual Report of Research Institute for Biological Function, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 55 - 61 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NM_010094 | - R. K. LINDEMANN et al., Mol. Cancer, (20030000), vol. 2, page 20 | - P. B. YU et al., Circulation, (20070000), vol. 116, no. II, page 60 | - P. B. YU et al., Nat. Chem. Biol., (20080000), vol. 4, pages 33 - 41 | - J. HAO et al., PLoS ONE, (20080000), vol. 3, no. 8, page e2904 | - MAE, SI.RYOSAKA, M. et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20180000), vol. 495, pages 954 - 61 | - SUSAKI EA et al., Nat protoc, (20150000), vol. 10, pages 1709 - 27 | - NOJIMA S. et al., Sci Rep, (20170000), vol. 24, page 9269 | - STEWART, K.BOUCHARD, M., Semin Cell Dev Biol, (20140000), vol. 36, pages 13 - 20 | - KOEHLER, K. R. et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20170000), vol. 35, pages 583 - 9 | - YURI, S. et al., Stem Cell Reports, (20170000), vol. 8, pages 401 - 16 | - RUTLEDGE, E. A.BENAZET, J. D.MCMAHON, A. P., Development, (20170000), vol. 144, pages 3177 - 88 | - WANG, P. et al., Cell Rep, (20180000), vol. 24, no. 3554-67, page e3 |