EP4038313 - ILLUMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING PASSIVE OPTICAL NANOSTRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RealD Spark, LLC Suite 400, 9777 Wilshire Blvd. Beverly Hills, CA 90212 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARROLD, Jonathan 9777 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 400 Beverly Hills, California 90212 / US | 02 /
ROBINSON, Michael G. 9777 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 400 Beverly Hills, California 90212 / US | 03 /
WOODGATE, Graham J. 9777 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 400 Beverly Hills, California 90212 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20872979.8 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020US53825 | Priority number, date | US201962910204P | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910204 P | US202062979029P | 20.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062979029 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067612 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038313 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/90, F21V5/00, G02B19/00, H01L25/075, H01L27/15, H01L33/58, // H01L33/60, H01L33/50 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR);
H01L33/58 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/24 (US);
H01L33/502 (EP,KR);
H01L33/505 (EP,KR);
H01L33/62 (US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR);
H01L2933/0058 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/60 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | F21K9/90, F21V5/00, G02B19/00, H01L25/075, H01L27/15, H01L33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DIE PASSIVE OPTISCHE NANOSTRUKTUREN UMFASST | [2022/32] | English: | ILLUMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING PASSIVE OPTICAL NANOSTRUCTURES | [2022/32] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT DES NANOSTRUCTURES OPTIQUES PASSIVES | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2496183 (OPTOVATE LTD [GB]); | [XA]WO2018185475 (OPTOVATE LTD [GB]); | [IA]WO2018231344 (UNIQARTA INC [US]); | [A]CN109119410 (AU OPTRONICS CORP); | [A]US2019257497 (HARROLD JONATHAN [GB], et al); | [P]US2019378744 (LIU PIN-MIAO [TW], et al) | International search | [A]US2010171215 (FISCHER HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]US2011038150 (WOODGATE GRAHAM JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]US2016211413 (PARK SEONG-JU [KR], et al) |