EP4041211 - IMPROVED TOPICAL COMPOSITION OF COLCHICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenvision Pharma LLP First Floor K. K. Chambers SIR P. T. Road Fort Mumbai, Maharashtra 400 001 / IN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOBBA, Sivakumar Venkata Zenvision Pharma LLP Plot No. A-310, MIDC, TTC Industrial Area Mahape Maharashtra Navi Mumbai 400709 / IN | 02 /
JADHAV, Bhimrao Zenvision Pharma LLP Plot No. A-310, MIDC TTC Industrial Area, Mahape Maharashtra Navi Mumbai 400709 / IN | 03 /
SHINDE, Dhananjay Zenvision Pharma LLP Plot No. A-310, MIDC TTC Industrial Area, Mahape Maharashtra Navi Mumbai 400709 / IN | 04 /
POPHALE, Sunil Zenvision Pharma LLP Plot No. A-310, MIDC TTC Industrial Area, Mahape Maharashtra Navi Mumbai 400709 / IN | 05 /
POL, Shankar Zenvision Pharma LLP Plot No. A-310, MIDC, TTC Industrial Area, Mahape Navi Mumbai 400709 Maharashtra / IN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20873626.4 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020IB59395 | Priority number, date | IN201921041165 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: IN201921041165 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070066 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041211 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K47/06, A61K47/08, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K47/12, A61K47/26, A61K31/165, A61P29/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (EP);
A61K47/08 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K47/14 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K9/0017 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | A61K31/165, A61K47/10, A61K9/10, A61K8/04, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON COLCHICIN | [2022/33] | English: | IMPROVED TOPICAL COMPOSITION OF COLCHICINE | [2022/33] | French: | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE AMÉLIORÉE DE COLCHICINE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007213393 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA], et al); | [XI]CN103251550 (SHANGHAI INST PLANNED PARENTHOOD RES, et al); | [XI]CN108057018 (BEIJING HUMANWELL JUNWEI PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD); | [XI]WO2019014380 (BLANCHARD JAMES [US]); | [I]WO2019060379 (ARCUTIS INC [US]); | [XI]WO2019116045 (HOOPER MARK [GB]); | International search | [Y]CN103142477 (XUE WEI); | [Y]CN108057018 (BEIJING HUMANWELL JUNWEI PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD); |