EP4043611 - MULTILAYER BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 9-1, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/20] | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2023/02] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | ||
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba daimon 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUYA, Akira c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 02 /
KOJIMA, Tadaaki c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hiroshi c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20873652.0 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP34516 | Priority number, date | JP20190186772 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019186772 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070561 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043611 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, B32B15/01, C23C8/08, C23C18/34, C23C18/42, C23C18/44, C23C18/52, C23C18/16, C23C18/32, C23C18/54, C23G1/08, H01L21/687 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H01L21/68757 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (KR);
C23C18/32 (EP,CN);
C23C18/1651 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B15/01 (EP);
B32B15/015 (US);
C23C18/1637 (US);
C23C18/1653 (CN,KR,US);
C23C18/1689 (KR,US);
C23C18/1696 (EP);
C23C18/1848 (KR);
C23C18/34 (EP,KR);
C23C18/36 (CN);
C23C18/42 (EP);
C23C18/44 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C18/50 (US);
C23C18/54 (EP,CN,KR);
C23C28/021 (CN,US);
C23C28/34 (KR);
C23C8/08 (KR);
C25D3/12 (US);
C23G1/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | C23C28/00, B32B15/01, C23C8/08, C23C18/34, C23C18/42, C23C18/44, C23C18/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/33] | English: | MULTILAYER BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/33] | French: | CORPS MULTICOUCHE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | Translation filed | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002241954 (PUROTONIKUSU KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2005196634 (ABE NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0048]; claims 1-4 *; | [A]JP2010037603 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2012285720 (CHOU GEORGE JYH-SHANN [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0018]; claims 1-20 *; | [XAI]US2013240256 (VON WERNE TIMOTHY [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 48] , [0 53] - [0060]; claims 19-40 * [A] 4,8,11 [I] 3,10 | International search | [A]JPH06132582 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [A]JPH11165375 (OMI TADAHIRO, et al)[A] 1-12; | [A]JP2008056978 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2018150971 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 | by applicant | JP2954716B | JP3094000B | JP2004360066 | JP2008056978 |