EP4027563 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20873682.7 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020CN113611 | Priority number, date | CN201910970091 | 12.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910970091 | [2022/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068693 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027563 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/02, H04L1/18, H04W4/40, H04W4/08, // H04L1/00, H04W72/00, H04W72/04 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04L1/1812 (CN);
H04L1/1861 (CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W4/08 (EP,CN);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN);
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04W72/40 (US);
H04L1/1838 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/28] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2022 | Translation filed | 07.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2018137452 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * abstract * [A] 5-7 [I] 3; | US2019349895 [ ] (LIU DEPING [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0137] *; | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Physical Layer Procedures for Sidelink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911110_PHYSICAL LAYER PROCEDURES FOR SIDELINK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1911110.zip R1-1911110_Physical layer procedures for sidelink.docx, (20191008), XP051809285 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2.1 * * page 3, paragraph 2.2 * |