EP4042901 - COSMETIC PACKAGING TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Axilone Shunhua Aluminum & Plastic Co., Ltd No. 88 Xiaoyue 329 National Highway Shangyu Zhejiang 312367 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Weifeng No. 88 Xiaoyue 329 National Highway Shangyu District Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312367 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Yongqing No. 88 Xiaoyue 329 National Highway Shangyu District Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312367 / CN | 03 /
SONG, Jianhua No. 88 Xiaoyue 329 National Highway Shangyu District Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312367 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20873786.6 | 28.06.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN98512 | Priority number, date | CN201910968508 | 12.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910968508 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068561 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042901 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/06 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A45D40/06 (EP,CN,US);
A45D2040/0025 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSTUBE FÜR KOSMETIKUM | [2022/33] | English: | COSMETIC PACKAGING TUBE | [2022/33] | French: | TUBE D'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | Translation filed | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 22.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2838169 (GEORGE GRAU); | [A]US2896778 (HOPGOOD ROBERT B); | [XY]US3272327 (JOHN BUSCH); | [A]GB1093199 (UNITED TOOL & PLASTICS INC); | [Y]JPH10127339 (KATSUSHIKA KK); | [A]US6082372 (MIZUKAKI TORU [JP]); | [A]US6116801 (PATEL MANHAR K [US], et al); | [YA]US6244770 (HOLLOWAY THOMAS F [US]); | [Y]US6290414 (SEEBACH JR HENRY F [US], et al); | [A]JP4121593B ; | [A]CN203597535U (SUZHOU YOUJIA PLASTIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]JP2016527019 ; | [A]CN107232736 (ZHEJIANG AXILONE SHUNHUA ALUMINUM INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]CN207837036U (ALBEA PLASTIC METALLIZING TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD) | International search | [A]CN1128123 (HIDAN CO [JP]); | [A]JP2006087538 (KATSUSHIKA KK); | [A]CN201839988U (ZHEJIANG AXILONE SHUNHUA ALUMINUM INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]CN202653454U (SHANGHAI YINGJIANG PLASTIC MOLD CO LTD); | [A]KR20130006615U ; | [A]CN203662194U (ZHEJIANG AXILONE SHUNHUA ALUMINUM INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [X]CN107232736 (ZHEJIANG AXILONE SHUNHUA ALUMINUM INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [PX]CN110801095 (ZHEJIANG AXILONE SHUNHUA ALUMINUM INDUSTRY CO LTD) | other | GB671388 |