EP4043213 - POLYOLEFIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Kazuma c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
OHKURA, Masatoshi c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
NAKANISHI, Yuta c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20873962.3 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP36849 | Priority number, date | JP20190186528 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019186528 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070671 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043213 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, C08J5/18, H01G4/32, B32B27/08, H01G4/14 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B7/02 (KR);
B32B7/028 (KR);
B32B7/06 (KR);
H01G4/14 (EP);
H01G4/32 (EP,KR);
B32B2250/242 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/306 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/736 (EP);
B32B2307/746 (EP,CN);
C08J2323/12 (EP,CN);
C08J2423/12 (EP,CN);
C08J2423/20 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | B32B27/32, C08J5/18, H01G4/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINSCHICHT | [2022/33] | English: | POLYOLEFIN FILM | [2022/33] | French: | FILM DE POLYOLÉFINE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | Translation filed | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP3202825 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9,11,13 * claims 1,3,4,6 *[A] 2-7,10,12 | International search | [A]WO2015012324 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2015012165 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2015044406 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2015178615 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2017035884 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2017057247 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2017221781 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2018204001 (TORAY INDUSTRIES)[A] 1-13 | by applicant | JPH11273990 | JP2015120331 | JP2016068387 |