EP4042723 - SPATIAL AUDIO REPRESENTATION AND RENDERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILKAMO, Juha Annankatu 4 A 18 00120 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville Metsäpirtintie 2 C 15 02130 Espoo / FI | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 20874026.6 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020FI50639 | Priority number, date | GB20190014712 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201914712 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069793 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042723 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04S1/00, G10L19/008, H04S3/02, H04R5/027, H04R3/00, G10L25/06, G10K15/12, G10L19/16, H04S3/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04S7/305 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,GB);
G10K15/12 (EP);
G10L25/18 (US);
G10L25/21 (US);
H04S1/007 (EP);
H04S3/008 (EP);
H04S7/30 (GB);
G10L19/167 (EP);
H04S2400/15 (EP);
H04S2420/01 (EP,US);
H04S2420/03 (EP);
H04S2420/11 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04S7/00, H04S1/00, G10L19/008, H04S3/02, H04R5/027, H04R3/00, G10L25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | DARSTELLUNG UND WIEDERGABE VON RÄUMLICHEM AUDIO | [2022/33] | English: | SPATIAL AUDIO REPRESENTATION AND RENDERING | [2022/33] | French: | REPRÉSENTATION AUDIO SPATIALE ET RENDU | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013272527 (OOMEN ARNOLDUS WERNER JOHANNES [NL], et al); | [XI]US2015350801 (KOPPENS JEROEN GERARDUS HENRICUS [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2019086757 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [XI]US2019246236 (EHARA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) | International search | [XY]WO2014111829 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4, 9-16, 21 -25 * abstract; page 22, lines 3 - 5; page 26, lines 20 - 24; page 27, line 33 - page 28, line 7; page 28, lines 30 - 33; page 29, line 34; figs. 8, 11, 12, 14 * [Y] 5-8 and 17-20; | [A]GB2571949 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [X]GB2572420 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1, 13, 25 * abstract; page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 6; page 23, lines 24 - 25; page 26, line 28 - page 27, line 3; page 31, lines 6 - 14, 23 - 25; page 32, lines 1 - 3, 16-21; figs. 2, 6 *; | [Y]GB2572650 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [Y] 5-8 and 17-20 * abstract; page 33, lines 3 - 6; fig. 9 * | by applicant | US2013272527 | US2015350801 | WO2019086757 | US2019246236 | - J VILKAMOT BACKSTROMA KUNTZ, "Optimized covariance domain framework for time-frequency processing of spatial audio", Journal of the Audio Engineering Society, (20130000), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 403 - 411, XP093021901 | - VILKAMO, J.NEUGEBAUER, BPLOGSTIES, J., Journal of the Audio Engineering Society, vol. 59, no. 12, pages 936 - 943 | GB20160019573 | WO2017FI50778 |