EP3889235 - HOT-MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Se Kyung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Tae Jung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyun Woo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seong Du LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20874533.1 | 12.08.2020 | [2021/40] | WO2020KR10682 | Priority number, date | KR20190124524 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190124524 | KR20200098993 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200098993 | [2021/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071079 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889235 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889235 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J153/02, C08L53/02, C08F297/04, C08F8/06, C09J7/35 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C09J7/35 (EP);
C08L53/02 (KR);
C09J153/02 (CN,KR,US);
C08F297/044 (EP,KR);
C08F297/046 (EP,KR);
C08F8/06 (EP);
C08L53/025 (KR);
C09J11/06 (CN);
C09J11/08 (CN);
C09J153/025 (EP);
C09J7/387 (KR);
C08K5/01 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/06, C08F297/046 (EP);
C09J153/025, C08L53/025 (EP);
C09J153/02, C08L53/025, C08L71/02, C08K5/053 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | C09J153/02, C08L53/02, C08F297/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEISSSCHMELZENDE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/40] | English: | HOT-MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2021/40] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE THERMOFUSIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | Translation filed | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0516203 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US5747598 (COOLBAUGH THOMAS S [US], et al); | [A]US2015191637 (GILLEN JASON DREW [US]); | [A]EP3336153 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2018258328 (NOZAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019132322 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]KR20110048893 (KOREA KUMHO PETROCHEM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0104]. *; | [Y]KR20060129337 (KRATON POLYMERS RES BV [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraph [0004]. *; | [A]JP2017503069 [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20170036688 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. * | [Y] - Zhao Zhongfu, Liu Peiying, Zhang Chunqing, Liu Wei, Ding Yifu, Zhang Yandong, Meng Fanzhi, Tang Tao, "Synthesis and structure-property relationships of SIS-g-PB copolymers and their application in hot-melt pressure-sensitive adhesives", RSC Advances, (20170101), vol. 7, no. 70, doi:10.1039/C7RA08180D, pages 44068 - 44075, XP055800882 [Y] 1-15 * See abstract, and page 44069. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7RA08180D |