EP4042340 - DYNAMIC MONITORING AND SECURING OF FACTORY PROCESSES, EQUIPMENT AND AUTOMATED SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanotronics Imaging, Inc. 2251 Front Street Suite 110 Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio 44223 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUTMAN, Matthew, C. 68 Cheever Place, Apt 2 Brooklyn, NY 11231 / US | 02 /
PUTMAN, John, B. 1102 Celebration Avenue Celebration, FL 34747 / US | 03 /
PINSKIY, Vadim 1313 Crossing Way Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 04 /
LIMOGE, Damas 196 Clinton Avenue C54 Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | 05 /
SUNDSTROM, Andrew 129 Columbia Heights, Apt. 45 Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | 06 /
WILLIAMS III, James 430 East 86th Street, Apt. 6E New York, NY 10028 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20874557.0 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US52254 | Priority number, date | US201962912291P | 08.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962912291 P | US201962931453P | 06.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931453 P | US201962932063P | 07.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962932063 P | US201962938158P | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938158 P | US201962950588P | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962950588 P | US202016781193 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: US202016781193 | US202062983487P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062983487 P | US202016904984 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: US202016904984 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071675 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042340 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, G05B13/04, G05B19/04, G06F9/455, G06N3/08, G06F21/53, G06F30/27, G05B19/05, G05B19/418, G06F21/55, G06N20/00, H04L9/40, G05B19/042, G06F21/57 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP,KR,US);
G05B19/4155 (US);
G05B23/02 (KR);
G05B23/0275 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/56 (KR,US);
G06F21/566 (EP);
G06N20/10 (EP,KR);
G06N3/063 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
H04L63/1425 (EP);
G05B2219/31368 (US);
G06F21/577 (EP);
G06F2221/034 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
H04L63/1433 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | G06N20/00, G06F11/30, G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES ÜBERWACHEN UND SICHERN VON FABRIKPROZESSEN, AUSRÜSTUNG UND AUTOMATISIERTEN SYSTEMEN | [2022/33] | English: | DYNAMIC MONITORING AND SECURING OF FACTORY PROCESSES, EQUIPMENT AND AUTOMATED SYSTEMS | [2022/33] | French: | SURVEILLANCE ET SÉCURISATION DYNAMIQUES DE SYSTÈMES AUTOMATISÉS, D'ÉQUIPEMENT ET DE PROCESSUS D'USINE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015213369 (BRANDT DAVID D [US], et al); | [X]US2019068618 (MESTHA LALIT KESHAV [US], et al); | [X]CN109766992 (UNIV BEIJING TECHNOLOGY); | [A]US2019238568 (GOSWAMI GAURAV [IN], et al); | International search | [X]US2015213369 (BRANDT DAVID D [US], et al); | [A]US2017102696 (BELL NOEL HOWARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019686718 | CN109766992 |