EP4042980 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE INTERVERTEBRAL FUSION CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&K Biomed Co., Ltd. 201 16-25 Dongbaekjungang-ro 16beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17015 / KR | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Gook Jin 2dong 907ho, 187, Garak-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05664 / KR | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20875115.6 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020KR13088 | Priority number, date | KR20190124087 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190124087 | [2022/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071150 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042980 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/30, A61B17/86, A61B17/70, A61B17/84, A61F2/28 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/8625 (EP);
A61F2/4455 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/846 (EP);
A61B17/863 (EP,KR);
A61F2/30749 (EP,KR);
A61F2/30767 (KR);
A61F2/30771 (US);
A61F2/447 (EP);
A61F2002/2835 (EP);
A61F2002/30398 (EP);
A61F2002/30405 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30476 (EP);
A61F2002/30507 (EP);
A61F2002/30515 (EP);
A61F2002/30518 (EP);
A61F2002/30537 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30556 (EP);
A61F2002/30578 (EP);
A61F2002/30579 (KR);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30784 (US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | A61F2/44, A61F2/30, A61B17/86, A61B17/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | HÖHENVERSTELLBARER INTERVERTEBRALER FUSIONSKÄFIG | [2022/33] | English: | HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE INTERVERTEBRAL FUSION CAGE | [2022/33] | French: | CAGE DE FUSION INTERVERTÉBRALE RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2022 | Translation filed | 06.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]KR20140009453 (SYNTHES GMBH [CH]) [Y] 1-9,13-15 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0124]; and figures 1a-15e. *; | [A]US2017224505 (BUTLER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 10-12; | [A]US2018193160 (HSU SHAO-KEH [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [Y]US2019038435 (DAFFINSON BRION [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,13-15 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0070]; and figures 1-17. *; | [A]US2019133782 (MCLAUGHLIN COLM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [PX]KR102147077B (L&K BIOMED CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-15* See claims 1-9 and 11-15. *This document is a published earlier application that serves as a basis for claiming priority of the present international application. * | by applicant | US2014277487 | US9585762 | US2019133782 |