EP4042348 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN INTELLIGENT SOURCING ENGINE FOR STUDY PARTICIPANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Userzoom Technologies, Inc. 3500 South Dupont Highway Dover, DE 19901 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESTRES, Xavier Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
PONTE, Eduard Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
CANCHAL, Xavier Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
ANELL, Marc Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
MATILE, David Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
ABOYTES, Jorge Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 07 /
ALAYO, Roc Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | 08 /
IBANEZ, Jordi Av. Diagonal 618, 3-D 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20875145.3 | 06.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US54439 | Priority number, date | US201962913142P | 09.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962913142 P | US202017063368 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: US202017063368 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071860 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042348 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, G16H10/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0639 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE INTELLIGENTE BESCHAFFUNGSMASCHINE FÜR STUDIENTEILNEHMER | [2022/33] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN INTELLIGENT SOURCING ENGINE FOR STUDY PARTICIPANTS | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À UN MOTEUR DE RECHERCHE INTELLIGENTE DE PARTICIPANTS À UNE ÉTUDE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 14.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 01.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012131476 (MESTRES XAVIER [ES], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1A-4; claims 1-28 *; | [I]US2014052853 (MESTRES XAVIER [ES], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0078] ** figures 1A-8; claims 1-84 * | International search | [Y]US2005182663 (ABRAHAM-FUCHS KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9, 11-20, 22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2005254775 (HAMILTON WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-9, 11-20, 22 * entire document *; | [A]US2010004951 (ALVES FERNANDO F [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2011307340 (BENMBAREK AKRAM [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2016217481 (PASTORE JACQUELINE STETSON [US]) [A] 1-22* entire document * |