EP4024059 - CIRCUIT FOR ALTERNATING CURRENT AND DIRECT CURRENT LEAKAGE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Topscomm Communication Co., Ltd 858 Huaguan Rd., Hi-tech District Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Chengwen 858 Huaguan Rd., Hi-tech District Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jianhua 858 Huaguan Rd., Hi-tech District Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Zhen 858 Huaguan Rd., Hi-tech District Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20875192.5 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN119325 | Priority number, date | CN201910954730 | 09.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910954730 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068833 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024059 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4024059 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/52, H02H3/33, G01R15/18, G01R19/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R19/25 (CN);
G01R19/0015 (EP);
H02H3/17 (EP);
G01R15/185 (EP);
H02H1/003 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G01R31/00, G01R19/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR WECHSELSTROM- UND GLEICHSTROMLECKDETEKTION | [2022/27] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR ALTERNATING CURRENT AND DIRECT CURRENT LEAKAGE DETECTION | [2022/27] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉTECTION DE FUITE DE COURANT ALTERNATIF ET DE COURANT CONTINU | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 08.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014022686 (MEISEL RAINER [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0055]; figure 1; claims 1-17 *; | [A]EP3242369 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0108]; figures 1-8; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2018056802 (MARTEL JEAN MARY [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0055] - [0083]; figures 1-3; claims 1-29D *; | [A]DE102019202474 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0049] - [0088]; figures 1-10; claims 1-18 * |